Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Acol Dalis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baguio

Titular Bishop of Thabraca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1925BornSablan
15 Dec 195328.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines
18 Nov 198762.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa), Philippines
18 Nov 198762.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
25 Feb 198862.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
11 Jul 200075.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Baguio, Philippines
27 Oct 200479.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baguio, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Acol Dalis:
Bishop Sebastian Acol Dalis (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baguio

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,529
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013