Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nestor Celestial Cariño

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1938Born
31 Dec 196123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Legazpi, Philippines
9 Mar 197839.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Legazpi, Philippines
9 Mar 197839.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
31 May 197839.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
12 Aug 198041.9AppointedBishop of Borongan, Philippines
31 Jan 198647.3ResignedBishop of Borongan, Philippines
11 Jun 200364.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Daet, Philippines
11 Jun 200364.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Acholla
1 Apr 200566.5AppointedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
7 Nov 200769.1ResignedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
24 May 202586.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Legazpi, Philippines

MicroData Summary
Nestor Celestial Cariño
Bishop Nestor Celestial Cariño
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalinao
Ordained BishopSt. Gregory the Great, Cathedral, Legazpi, Diocese of Legazpi
Death PlaceCardinal Santos Medical Center, San Juan City
Buried Place (Original)St. Gregory the Great, Cathedral, Legazpi, Diocese of Legazpi

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2007
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,252
  • d: CB, 24 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 24 May 2025