Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Yuzon Medroso

Bishop Emeritus of Tagbilaran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1938 BornOrmoc
30 Mar 196324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Palo, Philippines
18 Dec 198648.1AppointedBishop of Borongan, Philippines
17 Mar 198748.3Ordained BishopBishop of Borongan, Philippines
17 Oct 200667.9AppointedBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
14 Dec 200668.1InstalledBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
13 Oct 201677.9RetiredBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Yuzon Medroso
Bishop Leonardo Yuzon Medroso (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tagbilaran

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tagbilaran.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016