Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Realubin Tobias

Bishop Emeritus of Novaliches, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1941 Born
21 Dec 196524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
3 Nov 198241.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
3 Nov 198241.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
25 Jan 198341.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
14 Sep 198443.2AppointedBishop of Pagadian, Philippines
28 May 199351.9AppointedBishop of San Fernando de La Union, Philippines
21 Jun 200362.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Novaliches, Philippines
25 Nov 200362.4AppointedBishop of Novaliches, Philippines
6 Jun 201977.9RetiredBishop of Novaliches, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonio Realubin Tobias
Bishop Antonio Realubin Tobias (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Novaliches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlocos Norte

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Novaliches.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast