Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenceslao Selga Padilla, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Ulaanbaatar, Mongolia

Titular Bishop of Tharros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1949Born
17 Mar 197626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
19 Apr 199242.5AppointedSuperior of Urga, Mongolia
8 Jul 200252.7AppointedPrefect of Ulaanbaatar, Mongolia
2 Aug 200353.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tharros
29 Aug 200353.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tharros
25 Sep 201868.9DiedPrefect of Ulaanbaatar, Mongolia

MicroData Summary for Wenceslao Selga Padilla
Bishop Wenceslao Selga Padilla C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Ulaanbaatar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTubao
Ordained BishopSaints Peter and Paul, Church, Ulaanbaatar, Prefecture Apostolic of Ulaanbaatar
Death PlaceUlaanbaatar, Prefecture Apostolic of Ulaanbaatar

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,445
  • d: CB, 25 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast