Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Salgado y Garrucho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Romblon, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1936Born
23 Dec 196125.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 198852.1AppointedBishop of Romblon, Philippines
25 Jul 198852.2Ordained BishopBishop of Romblon, Philippines
30 Jan 199760.7ResignedBishop of Romblon, Philippines
9 Apr 200568.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Romblon, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Vicente Salgado y Garrucho
Bishop Vicente Salgado y Garrucho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Romblon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBacolod

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,727
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast