Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Warlito Itucas Cajandig

Vicar Apostolic of Calapan

Titular Bishop of Ausafa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1944 BornDumarao
21 Mar 197026.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 198945.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Calapan, Philippines
17 Apr 198945.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausafa
21 Jun 198945.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausafa

MicroData Summary for Warlito Itucas Cajandig:
Bishop Warlito Itucas Cajandig (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Calapan

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,771
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 17 Jul 2015