Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Mollenedo Mondejar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1924Born
4 Apr 195328.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 197045.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
17 Jul 197045.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Grumentum
30 Aug 197045.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Grumentum
19 Dec 197450.2AppointedBishop of Romblon, Philippines
21 Nov 198763.1AppointedBishop of San Carlos, Philippines
10 Feb 198863.4InstalledBishop of San Carlos, Philippines
25 Jul 200176.8RetiredBishop of San Carlos, Philippines
10 Feb 201994.4DiedBishop Emeritus of San Carlos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Mollenedo Mondejar
Bishop Nicolas Mollenedo Mondejar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabatuan

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 23 Jul 2015
  • i/d: CB, 10 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast