Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cirilo Reyes Almario

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malolos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1931BornCaridad
30 Nov 195625.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 197342.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Malolos, Philippines
22 Aug 197342.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaba
18 Oct 197342.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaba
15 Dec 197746.9SucceededBishop of Malolos, Philippines
20 Jan 199665.0ResignedBishop of Malolos, Philippines
14 Oct 201685.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Malolos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Cirilo Reyes Almario (VIAF: 89206413)
Bishop Cirilo Reyes Almario (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malolos

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015
  • d: CB, 14 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016