Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilfredo Dasco Manlapaz

Bishop Emeritus of Tagum, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1941 Born
6 Dec 196423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
22 Dec 198039.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maasin, Philippines
22 Dec 198039.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
7 Feb 198139.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
31 Jan 198644.8AppointedBishop of Tagum, Philippines
7 Apr 201877.0RetiredBishop of Tagum, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Wilfredo Dasco Manlapaz (VIAF: 89052452)
Bishop Wilfredo Dasco Manlapaz (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tagum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParacale

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tagum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp: CB, 20 Jul 2015
  • mn: CB, 28 Jul 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 May 2018

Quantcast