Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Gaviola y Garcés

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1922BornDansalan
2 Apr 194926.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 196340.6AppointedBishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
4 Jun 196340.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
31 May 196744.8ResignedBishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
31 May 196744.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Girba
2 Mar 197451.5AppointedBishop of Philippines, Military
13 Apr 198158.7AppointedArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines
30 Dec 199270.4ResignedArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines
13 Oct 199876.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lipa, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Mariano Gaviola y Garcés:
Archbishop Mariano Gaviola y Garcés (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lipa

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013