Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gilbert Armea Garcera

Archbishop of Lipa, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1959 Born
29 May 198324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
4 Apr 200748.1AppointedBishop of Daet, Philippines
29 Jun 200748.4Ordained BishopBishop of Daet, Philippines
30 Jun 200748.4InstalledBishop of Daet, Philippines
2 Feb 201758.0AppointedArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Armea Garcera
Archbishop Gilbert Armea Garcera (born ) Archbishop of Lipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagarao, Camarines Sur

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lipa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,439
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Feb 2017