Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin de Jesus Almoneda

Bishop Emeritus of Daet, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1930 Born
22 Mar 195827.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 198959.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Daet, Philippines
19 Dec 198959.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thimida
6 Jan 199059.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thimida
7 Jun 199161.1AppointedBishop of Daet, Philippines
4 Apr 200776.9RetiredBishop of Daet, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Benjamin de Jesus Almoneda
Bishop Benjamin de Jesus Almoneda (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Daet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaga City

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Daet.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,687
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Feb 2017