Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Sumaylo Tumulak

Deceased

Bishop of Philippines, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1944Born
30 Mar 197126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cebu, Philippines
12 Jan 198742.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
12 Jan 198742.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
16 Mar 198742.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesvi
28 Nov 199248.1AppointedBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
15 Jan 200560.2AppointedBishop of Philippines, Military
17 Jun 201772.7DiedBishop of Philippines, Military

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Sumaylo Tumulak
Bishop Leopoldo Sumaylo Tumulak (born , died ) Bishop of Philippines, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantander
Death PlaceCardinal Santos Hospital, San Juan City

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 17 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017