Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Sanchez Zafra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tagbilaran, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1920Born
4 Mar 194424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tagbilaran, Philippines
31 Jul 196747.5AppointedBishop of Dipolog, Philippines
22 Oct 196747.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dipolog, Philippines
20 Oct 198666.7AppointedBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
21 Apr 199272.2RetiredBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
4 Aug 200282.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Tagbilaran, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Felix Sanchez Zafra
Bishop Felix Sanchez Zafra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tagbilaran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClarin

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018