Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximiano Tuazon Cruz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calbayog


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1923BornCatbalogan
30 Nov 194724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Calbayog, Philippines
10 Nov 198764.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calbayog, Philippines
10 Nov 198764.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
1 Dec 198764.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
20 Dec 199471.7AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
25 Jan 199571.8InstalledBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
13 Jan 199975.7RetiredBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
9 Oct 201390.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Calbayog, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Maximiano Tuazon Cruz:
Bishop Maximiano Tuazon Cruz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calbayog

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,606
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015