Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rex Cullingham Ramírez

Bishop of Naval, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1967 Born
27 Mar 199527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Palo, Philippines
13 Oct 201749.8AppointedBishop of Naval, Philippines
9 Jan 201850.0Ordained BishopBishop of Naval, Philippines
12 Jan 201850.0InstalledBishop of Naval, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Rex Cullingham Ramírez
Bishop Rex Cullingham Ramírez (born ) Bishop of Naval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalangiga, Ester Samar, Archdiocese of Palo
Ordained BishopOur Lord's Transifiguration, Cathedral, Palo, Archdiocese of Palo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Naval.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2017
  • ob: CB, 23 Oct 2017
  • obp: CB, 30 Dec 2017
  • i: CB, 2 Jan 2018
  • c2: CB, 8 Jan 2018
  • c34: CB, 8 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,661

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast