Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Sy Uy

Bishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1966 Born
14 Apr 199326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Talibon, Philippines
13 Oct 201649.9AppointedBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
5 Jan 201750.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines
6 Jan 201750.2InstalledBishop of Tagbilaran, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Alberto Sy Uy
Bishop Alberto Sy Uy (born ) Bishop of Tagbilaran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUbay, Bohol
Ordained BishopMost Holy Trinity Cathedral, Talibon, Diocese of Talibon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tagbilaran.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 16 Oct 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 27 Oct 2016
  • c2: CB, 4 Jan 2017
  • c34: CB, 4 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jan 2017