Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brigido Agalpas Galasgas

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe

Titular Bishop of Leptiminus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1940BornBokod
28 Dec 196626.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 199251.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines
6 Jul 199251.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
25 Nov 199252.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
15 May 199554.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Brigido Agalpas Galasgas:
Bishop Brigido Agalpas Galasgas (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,987
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • mn: CB, 24 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 25 Jul 2015