Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marlo Mendoza Peralta

Archbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1950 Born
31 Mar 197524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Urdaneta, Philippines
14 Jan 200655.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alaminos, Philippines
31 Mar 200655.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Alaminos, Philippines
1 Jul 200756.9SucceededBishop of Alaminos, Philippines
30 Dec 201363.4AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Marlo Mendoza Peralta
Archbishop Marlo Mendoza Peralta (born ) Archbishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Carlos

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nueva Segovia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,106
  • s: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jul 2017