Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Barnuevo Bendico

Bishop of Baguio, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1960 Born
14 Apr 198424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Capiz, Philippines
1 Oct 201656.6AppointedBishop of Baguio, Philippines
10 Jan 201756.9Ordained BishopBishop of Baguio, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Victor Barnuevo Bendico
Bishop Victor Barnuevo Bendico (born ) Bishop of Baguio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoxas City
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Atonement, Cathedral, Baguio, Diocese of Baguio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baguio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2016
  • mn: CB, 1 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 7 Oct 2016
  • c2+: CB, 17 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast