Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Augustine Hendrick

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1849Born
7 Jun 187323.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 190353.8AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
23 Aug 190353.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
29 Nov 190960.0DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Thomas Augustine Hendrick
Bishop Thomas Augustine Hendrick (born , died ) Bishop of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenn Yan, NY, USA

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 417
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast