Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Maria Barone

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1844BornTorino
13 Oct 186723.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189247.8AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
17 Jul 189247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
17 Mar 190358.5ResignedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
17 Mar 190358.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
27 Nov 190864.2AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
20 May 190964.7DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Maria Barone:
Archbishop Paolo Maria Barone (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 187, and Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013