Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Raiti, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trapani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1864Born
22 Jun 190339.3AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
28 Jun 190339.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
6 Dec 190642.8AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
1 May 193268.2DiedBishop of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Raiti
Bishop Francesco Maria Raiti O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Trapani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinguaglossa

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast