Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Chieppa

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1863BornAndria
24 Sep 188723.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 190339.5AppointedBishop of Cariati, Italy
5 Jul 190339.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati, Italy
23 Jun 190945.5AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
15 Oct 191854.9DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Chieppa:
Bishop Lorenzo Chieppa (born , died ) Bishop of Lucera

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013