Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Leo

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1864BornAndria
19 Sep 188723.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 190945.2AppointedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
11 Jul 190945.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
17 Jan 192055.8AppointedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
20 Jan 193974.8DiedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Leo:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Leo (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013