Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildefonso Vincenzo Pisani, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

Titular Bishop of Thebae in Thebaide


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1846Born
1865²18.9ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
10 Feb 190862.1AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
1 Mar 190862.1Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
3 Jan 191266.0ResignedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
3 Jan 191266.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thebae in Thebaide
21 May 192478.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso Vincenzo Pisani
Bishop Ildefonso Vincenzo Pisani C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatanzaro
Ordained BishopSt Pierre aux Liens, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 55
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 17
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,882

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast