Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Foronda, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Cebu

Titular Bishop of Calydon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1665²BornBadajoz, Spain
2 Mar 172257.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cebu, Philippines
2 Mar 172257.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
30 Nov 172358.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
20 May 172863.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Foronda:
Bishop Sebastián Foronda O.S.A. (born 1665, died ) Apostolic Administrator of Cebu

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,542
  • ob/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 41, Number 153
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 138, and Page 291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015