Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Molina y Figueroa

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1672Born
20 Nov 172452.4AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
Nov 1726³54.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
1 May 173865.9DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Molina y Figueroa
Bishop Felipe Molina y Figueroa (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArévalo, Spain

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,468
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 44, Number 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 69
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017