Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Protacio Cabezas

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1690¹Born
17 Jan 174050.0SelectedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
29 Aug 174050.6ConfirmedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
26 Jul 174454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
3 Feb 175363.0DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Protacio Cabezas
Bishop Protacio Cabezas (born 1690, died ) Bishop of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017