Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidro de Arevalo

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1694³Born
17 Jan 174045.8SelectedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
29 Aug 174046.4ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
3 Nov 174349.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
1751¹56.8DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidro de Arevalo
Bishop Isidro de Arevalo (born , died 1751) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCebu
Ordained BishopMacau, Diocese of Macau, China

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,429
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Aug 2020

Quantcast