Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan López, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1613BornVilla Martin Munoz de las Posadas, Spain
10 Feb 166349.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Apr 166350.0AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
4 Jan 166551.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
14 Nov 167259.6AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
12 Feb 167460.8DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Juan López:
Archbishop Juan López O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a priest for 11.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 254
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 199, Number 1,251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013