Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonieto Dumagan Cabajog

Bishop of Surigao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1956 BornCebu City
9 Apr 198124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tagbilaran, Philippines
13 Jan 199942.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
13 Jan 199942.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Reperi
16 Mar 199942.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Reperi
21 Apr 200144.9AppointedBishop of Surigao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonieto Dumagan Cabajog:
Bishop Antonieto Dumagan Cabajog (born ) Bishop of Surigao

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Surigao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,485
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015