Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julito Buhisan Cortes

Bishop of Dumaguete


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1956 BornParañaque
24 Oct 198024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Dumaguete, Philippines
24 Oct 200145.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
24 Oct 200145.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Severiana
8 Jan 200245.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Severiana
28 Sep 201357.2AppointedBishop of Dumaguete, Philippines
5 Dec 201357.4InstalledBishop of Dumaguete, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Julito Buhisan Cortes:
Bishop Julito Buhisan Cortes (born ) Bishop of Dumaguete

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dumaguete.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,107
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2013
  • i: CB, 4 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 6 Dec 2013