Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Glenn Montebon Corsiga

Bishop-Elect of Ipil, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1965 Born
14 Dec 199328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dumaguete, Philippines
14 Apr 202560.2AppointedBishop of Ipil, Philippines
29 Jul 202560.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ipil, Philippines
14 Aug 202560.5InstalledBishop of Ipil, Philippines

MicroData Summary
Glenn Montebon Corsiga
Father Glenn Montebon Corsiga
(born )
Bishop-Elect of Ipil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDumaguete City, Diocese of Dumaguete

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Ipil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 15 May 2025