Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Ocio y Campo

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1688¹BornCelaya, México
20 Jan 173446.0AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
21 Aug 173547.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
21 Jul 173749.5DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Ocio y Campo:
Bishop Manuel de Ocio y Campo (born 1688, died ) Bishop of Cebu

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,518
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015