Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Asís Aguilar y Serrat

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1826Born
23 Dec 185428.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 188054.1SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
16 Dec 188054.1ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
6 Mar 188154.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
16 Dec 189973.1DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Asís Aguilar y Serrat (VIAF: 56793368)
Bishop Francisco de Asís Aguilar y Serrat (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta María de Marlés, Diocese of Ávila
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 510
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017