Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Catalá y Albosa

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1835Born
28 Feb 187943.3AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
13 Apr 187943.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
26 Jul 188347.7SelectedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
9 Aug 188347.7ConfirmedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
1 Mar 189963.3DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Catalá y Albosa (VIAF: 305861100)
Bishop Jaime Catalá y Albosa (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArenys de Mar
Ordained BishopToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017