Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Maura y Gelabert

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1841Born
10 Jun 186524.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 188645.0AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
21 Sep 188645.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
24 Jan 191068.6DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Maura y Gelabert (VIAF: 87128453)
Bishop Juan Maura y Gelabert (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma de Mallorca
Ordained BishopPresentation, Madrid

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 428
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017