Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Beltrán y Asensio

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1838Born
20 Dec 186224.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 189759.0SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
24 Mar 189859.7ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
10 Jul 189860.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
3 Nov 191779.3DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Beltrán y Asensio
Bishop Joaquín Beltrán y Asensio (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCieza, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Murcie

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018