Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Bux y Loras

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Titular Bishop of Magydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1823Born
1851¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188258.3SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
30 Mar 188258.3ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
30 Mar 188258.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
18 Jun 188258.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
1883¹59.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Bux y Loras
Bishop Juan Francisco Bux y Loras (born , died 1883) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFortanete, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopS. Sebastien, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018