Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gallicano Mergè

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy

Titular Bishop of Arethusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1843Born
22 May 186926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Palestrina, Italy
18 May 189451.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
18 May 189451.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
27 May 189451.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
7 Jul 189754.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gallicano Mergè (VIAF: 307390150)
Bishop Gallicano Mergè (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGallicano, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina
Ordained BishopS, Felippo Neri, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017