Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioannis Privilegio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tinos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1846BornSyros
12 Apr 190558.5AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
12 Apr 190558.5AppointedBishop of Mykonos, Greece
2 Jun 190558.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos, Greece
9 Aug 1914³67.8ResignedBishop of Tinos, Greece
9 Aug 1914³67.8ResignedBishop of Mykonos, Greece
18 Dec 191973.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tinos, Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ioannis Privilegio:
Bishop Ioannis Privilegio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tinos

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,035
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013