Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Giuseppe Seminara, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crete {Candia}

Titular Bishop of Echinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1863BornGangi
14 Jun 189128.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Jun 191047.3AppointedBishop of Crete {Candia}, Greece
21 Aug 191047.4Ordained BishopBishop of Crete {Candia}, Greece
15 Mar 192663.0ResignedBishop of Crete {Candia}, Greece
15 Mar 192663.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
26 Apr 193976.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Crete {Candia}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giuseppe Seminara:
Bishop Francesco Giuseppe Seminara O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crete {Candia}

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015