Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roberto Menini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Gangra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1837Born
5 Jul 186325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Jan 188042.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
30 Jan 188042.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
2 Feb 188042.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
5 May 1885³47.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
19 May 188547.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gangra
12 Oct 191678.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roberto Menini (VIAF: 23137485)
Archbishop Roberto Menini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpalato
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 283, and Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017