Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Félix-Arséne Billard

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1829Born
17 Dec 185324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rouen, France
17 Feb 188151.3SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
13 May 188151.5ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
25 Jul 188151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
3 Dec 190172.1DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Félix-Arséne Billard (VIAF: 217429913)
Bishop Paul-Félix-Arséne Billard (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Valèry-en-Caux
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017