Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Emile-Marie-Joseph Henry

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1851Born
19 Dec 187423.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 189948.3SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
14 Dec 189948.4ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
24 Feb 190048.5Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
8 Jul 191159.9DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Emile-Marie-Joseph Henry
Bishop Paul-Emile-Marie-Joseph Henry (born , died ) Bishop of Grenoble

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlida, Algeria

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018