Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolphe-Casimir David

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1842BornSaint-Chinian
10 Jun 186523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
20 Jan 191269.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
20 Jan 191269.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
26 Feb 191269.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
16 Sep 191573.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France

MicroData Summary for Adolphe-Casimir David:
Bishop Adolphe-Casimir David (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013