Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Irénée Depéry

Deceased

Bishop of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1796BornChallex
23 Dec 182024.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 184448.1SelectedBishop of Gap, France
17 Jun 184448.3ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
1 Sep 184448.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
14 Sep 184448.5InstalledBishop of Gap, France
9 Dec 186165.8DiedBishop of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Irénée Depéry:
Bishop Jean-Irénée Depéry (born , died ) Bishop of Gap

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013