Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Rendu

Deceased

Bishop of Annecy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1789BornMeyrin près Genève
5 Mar 181424.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Jun 181424.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 184252.7SelectedBishop of Annecy, France
27 Jan 184353.1ConfirmedBishop of Annecy, France
9 Apr 184353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Annecy, France
28 Aug 185969.7DiedBishop of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Rendu:
Bishop Louis Rendu (born , died ) Bishop of Annecy

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013